U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mc-00005
  • Case Name: Nelson v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 09, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.