U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03411
  • Case Name: Young v. Cooper et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Case Submitted]
  • January 05, 2023: [Document]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 14, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 14, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 10, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.