U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Howard
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Text Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 02, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 17, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 16, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.