U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03416
  • Case Name: Harris v. Cooper et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 28, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 06, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 16, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 16, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.