U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03417
  • Case Name: Taylor v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 17, 2022: [Leave to Appeal]
  • November 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2022: [Complaint]
  • November 17, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.