U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03418
  • Case Name: Butler v. Hill
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 15, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous]
  • December 05, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 05, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.