U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01230-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 23, 2023: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Document]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • November 17, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.