U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trowbridge et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 30, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 22, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.