U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lovely
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Text Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 26, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 22, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.