U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03419
  • Case Name: Carmichael v. Chairperson of Publication Review Committee
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 29, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 28, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 18, 2022: [Complaint]
  • November 18, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.