U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03428
  • Case Name: Harris v. Clark et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 23, 2023: [Reopen Case]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 04, 2023: [Case Submitted]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.