U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03427
  • Case Name: Timms v. Slaydon et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • December 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 29, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 28, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 23, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.