U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03426
  • Case Name: McRavion v. Bullard et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2024
  • November 15, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 07, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 23, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 23, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.