U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03424
  • Case Name: McDonald v. Pittman
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 12, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 23, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 23, 2022: [Complaint]
  • November 23, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.