U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03431
  • Case Name: Patton v. Locklear
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Document]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 12, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 09, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • December 09, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 08, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 08, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 01, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 28, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.