U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03429
  • Case Name: Wallace v. Vaughn et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
January, 2025
  • January 29, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • October 08, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 08, 2024: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 02, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 02, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 01, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 28, 2022: [Complaint]
  • November 28, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.