U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02198
  • Case Name: Ingram v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • January 20, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 19, 2023: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 18, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 11, 2023: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 10, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 10, 2023: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 09, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2023: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • January 05, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 05, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 05, 2023: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • December 14, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • December 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 28, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.