U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sarki
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 20, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 17, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 17, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • November 28, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • November 28, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • November 28, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • November 28, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.