U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00378-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLLINS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • April 16, 2025: [SEALED USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reduce Sentence]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reduce Sentence ]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 23, 2023: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Oral Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 12, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 12, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • December 12, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 12, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 05, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 05, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • December 05, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 28, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.