U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00374-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARRINGTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 13, 2023: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Motions Referred]
  • January 13, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 10, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 10, 2023: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 28, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.