U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00376-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LANGSTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 08, 2022: [SEALED Motion for Exam Report and Treatment]
  • December 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • December 01, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 28, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 28, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.