U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00373-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CUTHRELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • December 15, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • December 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Arrest]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 28, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.