U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00308-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Surrender]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Probation]
  • January 17, 2023: [Waiver-Other]
  • January 17, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 17, 2023: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Probation]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.