U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00380-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OTT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 29, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.