U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00372-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NEWBOLD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • December 02, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 02, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2022: [Arrest]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 29, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.