U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00375-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JAIMEZ-PEACE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Mail Returned]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Motion for Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2022: [Motion for Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 09, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • December 06, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 06, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [Arrest]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 29, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.