U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00287-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • December 20, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2022: [Bond]
  • December 14, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 14, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Community Defender]
  • December 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 02, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • December 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 29, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.