U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03435
  • Case Name: Basco v. Franklin County Detention Center et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 28, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 22, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 05, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 02, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.