U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03436
  • Case Name: Conner v. Esquetini et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 06, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 06, 2025: [Remark]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Order]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 30, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.