U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crockett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 13, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Status Report ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.