U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00309-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Agreed Order of Payment - USPO]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [SEALED Document]
  • January 24, 2023: [Receipt for Passport]
  • January 24, 2023: [Bond ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 24, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • December 01, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 01, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.