U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03438
  • Case Name: Maye v. McKinney
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 14, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 08, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 08, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 02, 2022: [Complaint]
  • December 02, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.