U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03439
  • Case Name: Maye v. Pee Wee et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Expedite]
  • January 11, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 08, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 08, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 05, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 05, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.