U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02201
  • Case Name: Stepp v. Buffaloe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 20, 2023: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • January 20, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2254]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • December 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 05, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.