U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02202
  • Case Name: Wilkerson v. Durham County
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 13, 2023: [Case Submitted]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 05, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.