U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03441
  • Case Name: Miller v. New Hanover County Sheriff's Detention Officers et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • May 13, 2025: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • May 13, 2025: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 13, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 17, 2023: [Reconsideration]
  • January 17, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 13, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 13, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 08, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 05, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 05, 2022: [Complaint]
  • December 05, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.