U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02205
  • Case Name: Perkins v. Risk Assessment Panel
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • January 05, 2023: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 03, 2023: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 14, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 06, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 06, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.