U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02204
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
  • January 05, 2023: [Appoint Expert]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2022: [Remark]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [Certificate of a Sexually Dangerous Person]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.