U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Breeden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice Regarding Passport]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2022: [Bond]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 21, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 18, 2022: [Arrest]
  • December 07, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 07, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.