U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flack
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Arrest]
  • January 10, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 04, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 04, 2023: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 28, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 12, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 07, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 07, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.