U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue Other]
  • January 04, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 21, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 19, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 07, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 07, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.