U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bushyhead
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue Other]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 19, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • December 19, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 16, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Arrest]
  • December 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 07, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.