U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huntt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2022: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.