U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Howard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 04, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 20, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 08, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.