U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03447
  • Case Name: Butler v. Davenport et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 12, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 08, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 08, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.