U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03446
  • Case Name: Butler v. Cherry et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • April 28, 2025: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice-other]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 08, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 08, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 08, 2022: [Complaint]
  • December 08, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.