U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03445
  • Case Name: Hudson v. Biancardi et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • April 28, 2025: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 01, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Opinion from USCA]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time-Other]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 15, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 15, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 13, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 08, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.