U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00292-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sullivan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Suggestion of Death]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 13, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 13, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 09, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • December 08, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.