U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flowers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Case Number ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notification to Appeals Court of Filing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 28, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • December 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 08, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 08, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.