U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00319-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.